NC H502 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Voting Machines/Certain Cos
Title
Voting Machines/Certain Cos
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-27 | House | Filed |