NC H506 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Ch. Res 2019-9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm Steve Warren/Special Sup. Ct Judge

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirm Steve Warren/Special Sup. Ct Judge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseCh. Res 2019-9
2019-04-22 Ratified
2019-04-18SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-18SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-18SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-17SenateReptd Fav
2019-04-16SenateRe-ref Com On Select Committee on Nominations
2019-04-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-11HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-10HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-10HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-09HousePlaced On Cal For 04/10/2019
2019-04-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-08HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-01HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback