NC H512 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-548
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-548
Summary
Incentives for Energy Conservation.
Title
Incentives for Energy Conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-548 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-23 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-07-23 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-06-25 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-25 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-10 | Ref to the Com on Energy and Energy Efficiency, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S305 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H512 |