NC H517 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Stokes Co. Bd. Ed./Requested Election Changes
Title
Stokes Co. Bd. Ed./Requested Election Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H517 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H517v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H517v1.pdf |