NC H532 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - Ch. SL 2019-20
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

DNCR Add New Trails & Various Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNCR Add New Trails & Various Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-28 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-03 Ch. SL 2019-20
2019-06-03 Signed by Gov. 6/3/2019
2019-05-30 Pres. To Gov. 5/30/2019
2019-05-29 Ratified
2019-05-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-28HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-05-23HousePlaced On Cal For 05/28/2019
2019-05-23HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-05-22HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-05-22SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-21SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/21/2019
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-16SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-15SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-13SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-04-29HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-26HousePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-18HouseSerial Referral To Judiciary Stricken
2019-04-02HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S380 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback