NC H544 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Ch. SL 2015-166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County Sign Ordinance in Cities
Title
County Sign Ordinance in Cities
Sponsors
Rep. William Brawley [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] |
Rep. John Fraley [R] | Rep. Charles McGrady [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-21 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Ch. SL 2015-166 | |
2015-07-23 | Signed by Gov. 7/23/2015 | |
2015-07-23 | Pres. To Gov. 7/23/2015 | |
2015-07-22 | Ratified | |
2015-07-21 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-21 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015 |
2015-07-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-15 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/14/2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |