NC H546 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Ch. SL 2013-257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-10 - Ch. SL 2013-257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Roanoke Rapids Graded School District
Title
Roanoke Rapids Graded School District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-10 | Ch. SL 2013-257 | |
2013-07-10 | Ratified | |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2013 |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-04 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-03 | House | Filed |