NC H548 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Physical Therapy Definition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Physical Therapy Definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 103 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2019
2019-06-17 Ratified
2019-06-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-12SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2019
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-25HouseSerial Referral To Insurance Stricken
2019-04-03HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S574 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback