NC H55 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - Ch. SL 2019-206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Cleveland County/Sheriff Vacancies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cleveland County/Sheriff Vacancies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-28 Ch. SL 2019-206
2019-08-28 Ratified
2019-08-27HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-27HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-08-27HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-08-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-08-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-22SenateReptd Fav
2019-08-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-08-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-13SenateRe-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-02SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29HousePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-13HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S12 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Ch. SL 2019-5

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback