NC H550 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-18 - Ch. SL 2016-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Raleigh Apodaca Service Dog Retirement Act
Title
Raleigh Apodaca Service Dog Retirement Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-18 | Ch. SL 2016-101 | |
2016-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016 | |
2016-07-01 | Ratified | |
2016-06-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-30 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2016-06-23 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Finance Stricken |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | House | Filed |