NC H550 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urge Congressional Support of VA MISSION Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congressional Support of VA MISSION Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseAdopted
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-04-03HouseRef to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback