NC H555 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid Transformation Implementation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Transformation Implementation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - House - Veto Override (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 45 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-08-29 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l M11 Concur (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - House - M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 59 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 22 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-10-31SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-30SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/31/2019
2019-10-30SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-10-28SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/30/2019
2019-10-28SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-09-11SenateVeto Received from House
2019-09-11HouseVeto Overridden
2019-09-03HousePlaced On Cal For 09/10/2019
2019-09-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44.2
2019-08-30HouseReceived from the Governor
2019-08-30 Vetoed 08/30/2019
2019-08-29 Pres. To Gov. 8/29/2019
2019-08-29 Ratified
2019-08-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-29HouseConcurred On 3rd Reading
2019-08-28HouseConcurred On 2nd Reading
2019-08-27HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-08-27HouseRuled Material
2019-08-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-08-27SenateEngrossed
2019-08-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-26SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-22SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-08-22SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-22SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2019-08-21SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-08-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-08-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-08-21SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
2019-08-21SenateSequential Referral To Finance Added
2019-08-21SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2019-08-20SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-08-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-03HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-03HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-02HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-03HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-03HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-02HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H555
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H555v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/371
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/558
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/557
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/569
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/792
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/803
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/808

Bill Comments

feedback