NC H56 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Arts Education Requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arts Education Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-18HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-13HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S238 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback