NC H563 | 2009 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-08 - Ch. SL 2009-68

Summary

Delinquent Tax - Deny Building Permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delinquent Tax - Deny Building Permit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-08 Ch. SL 2009-68
2009-06-08 Ratified
2009-06-04 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-06-03 Reptd Fav
2009-05-04 Ref To Com On Finance
2009-05-04 Rec From House
2009-04-30 Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading
2009-04-29 Placed On Cal For 4/30/2009
2009-04-29 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2009-04-29 Reptd Fav
2009-04-13 Re-ref Com On Finance
2009-04-13 Reptd Fav Com Substitute
2009-03-12 Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance
2009-03-12 Passed 1st Reading
2009-03-11 Filed

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback