NC H563 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Honor Ralph Campbell Jr

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Ralph Campbell Jr

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-08 - House - R2 For Adopt (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-08 Adopted
2011-06-02 Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011
2011-06-02 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2011-06-02 Reptd Fav for Adoption
2011-03-31 Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2011-03-31 Passed 1st Reading
2011-03-30 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S693 (Same As) 2011-04-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback