NC H565 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-84
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Union Fire Fees
Title
Union Fire Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-84 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-06-30 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-05-12 | Failed Concur In S Amend | |
2009-08-10 | Postponed To 5/12/2010 | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred On 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Amends Ruled Material | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur In S Amend | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Without Prejudice | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |