NC H589 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Ch. SL 2010-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Ch. SL 2010-2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ins. & St. Hlth Plan Cover/Hearing Aids
Title
Ins. & St. Hlth Plan Cover/Hearing Aids
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt\No. 2\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 6\To Reconsider (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-08-07 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 6\To Reconsider (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-08-07 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-08-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Ch. SL 2010-2 | |
2010-06-07 | Signed By Gov. 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Pres. To Gov. 5/28/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Ratified | |
2010-05-26 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-05-25 | Conf Rpt Rtn To Conf Com | |
2010-05-25 | Reconsidered Adoption | |
2010-05-20 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-05-19 | Placed On Cal For 5/20/2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-05-12 | Conf Rpt Rtn To Conf Com | |
2010-05-12 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-10 | Postponed To 5/12/2010 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-07 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-08-06 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-07-23 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-07-22 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-22 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-22 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-07-21 | Placed On Cal For 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-07-09 | Assigned To Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | |
2009-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Insurance | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S375 (Same As) 2009-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget