NC H592 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study County Public-Private Partnerships
Title
Study County Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-07 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-13 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-05 | Ref to the Com on Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-04-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-04 | Filed |