NC H594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-23 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-23 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Disabled Vet Property Tax Exclusion
Title
Increase Disabled Vet Property Tax Exclusion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2009-07-23 | Rec From House | |
2009-07-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-20 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-05-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S177 (Same As) 2009-02-17 - Ref To Com On Finance