NC H604 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-27 - Ch. SL 2019-205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Small Business Retirement Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small Business Retirement Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-19 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-08-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-27 Ch. SL 2019-205
2019-08-27 Signed by Gov. 8/27/2019
2019-08-20 Pres. To Gov. 8/20/2019
2019-08-20 Ratified
2019-08-19HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-19HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-08-15HousePlaced On Cal For 08/19/2019
2019-08-13HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-08-13HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-12HousePlaced On Cal For 08/14/2019
2019-08-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-08-09HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-08-09SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-08-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-07SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-07-10SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-07-10SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback