NC H609 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
NC Cancer Treatment Fairness Act
Title
NC Cancer Treatment Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - House - A2 Stevens Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - M8 Re-Refer Insurance Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - House - A2 Stevens Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 87 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - M8 Re-Refer Insurance Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Insurance |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-09 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Amendment Withdrawn A1 |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/08/2013 |
2013-05-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2013-04-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-04-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2013 |
2013-04-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-09 | House | Ref To Com On Health and Human Services |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-08 | House | Filed |