NC H61 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 52-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-12 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I
Pending: Senate Judiciary I Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Speaker/Pro Tem Term Limits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speaker/Pro Tem Term Limits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 72 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - A3 Hackney\Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - A2 Spear\Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - A1 Blust\Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-12 Ref To Com On Judiciary I
2011-04-12 Passed 1st Reading
2011-04-08 Rec From House
2011-04-07 Ordered Engrossed
2011-04-07 Passed 3rd Reading
2011-04-06 Passed 2nd Reading
2011-04-06 Amend Failed 3
2011-04-06 Amend Failed 2
2011-04-06 Amend Adopted 1
2011-04-05 Postponed To 4/6/2011
2011-03-29 Postponed To 4/5/2011
2011-03-29 Withdrawn From Cal
2011-03-22 Postponed To 3/29/2011
2011-03-17 Postponed To 3/22/2011
2011-03-16 Placed On Cal For 3/17/2011
2011-03-16 Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2011-03-16 Reptd Fav
2011-03-10 Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
2011-03-10 Withdrawn From Com
2011-02-10 Ref To Com On Judiciary
2011-02-10 Passed 1st Reading
2011-02-09 Filed

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2011&BillID=H61&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/House/HTML/H61v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/House/HTML/H61v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2011/Bills/House/HTML/H61v2.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscriptP.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=H&RCS=216
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscriptP.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=H&RCS=217
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscriptP.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=H&RCS=218
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscriptP.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=H&RCS=219
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscriptP.pl?sSession=2011&sChamber=H&RCS=229

Bill Comments

feedback