NC H617 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Repeat Referral to Teen Court

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Repeat Referral to Teen Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-21 Ch. SL 2019-41
2019-06-21 Signed by Gov. 6/21/2019
2019-06-18 Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2019
2019-06-17 Ratified
2019-06-13SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-12SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2019
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-08HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-08HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback