NC H62 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

In-State Tuition/Members Served on USS NC

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-State Tuition/Members Served on USS NC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-26HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-19HouseRe-ref Com On Education - Community Colleges
2019-03-19HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-12HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback