NC H622 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-370
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-370
Summary
Exemptions for Louisburg and Currituck Co.
Title
Exemptions for Louisburg and Currituck Co.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucy Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Ch. SL 2009-370 | |
2009-07-27 | Ratified | |
2009-07-23 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-22 | Placed On Cal For 7/23/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-22 | Reptd Unfav For Conc | |
2009-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Local Government I | |
2009-06-02 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-05-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Amend Adopted #2 | |
2009-05-28 | Reconsidered 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-05-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-06 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-04-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Placed On Cal For 4/2/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-17 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2009-03-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H622 |