NC H625 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-01 - Ch. SL 2014-94
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning/Health Care Structure
Title
Zoning/Health Care Structure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-01 | Ch. SL 2014-94 | |
2014-08-01 | Signed by Gov. 8/1/2014 | |
2014-07-28 | Pres. To Gov. 7/28/2014 | |
2014-07-25 | Ratified | |
2014-07-24 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-24 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2014-07-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/24/2014 |
2014-07-23 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2014-07-23 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-07-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-10 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |