NC H628 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Ch. SL 2019-173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

2019 Banking & Mortgage Corrections & Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2019 Banking & Mortgage Corrections & Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-26 Ch. SL 2019-173
2019-07-26 Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019
2019-07-16 Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2019
2019-07-15 Ratified
2019-07-11HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-11HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-10HousePlaced On Cal For 07/11/2019
2019-07-10HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-10HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-10SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-21SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-09HouseRef to the Com on Banking, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-08HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback