NC H629 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-359
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-27 - Ch. SL 2009-359
Summary
Small Claims Court/Trials.
Title
Small Claims Court/Trials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-27 | Ch. SL 2009-359 | |
2009-07-27 | Signed By Gov. 7/27/2009 | |
2009-07-17 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Ratified | |
2009-07-15 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-14 | Placed On Cal For 7/15/2009 | |
2009-07-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-14 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-06-25 | Ref To Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-06-25 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-22 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-21 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-21 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Placed On Cal For 4/20/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-30 | Re-ref Com On Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-03-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-18 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity | |
2009-03-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H629 |