NC H629 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Substance Abuse Treatment
Title
Substance Abuse Treatment
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. David Guice [R] | Rep. Dan Ingle [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. Diane Parfitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-254 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Concurred In S Amend 2 | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-15 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 2 | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-14 | Amendment Withdrawn 1 | |
2011-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-13 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-02 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-05-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-29 | Rec From House | |
2011-04-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-27 | Placed On Cal For 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |