NC H629 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Definition of Special Purpose Project
Title
Amend Definition of Special Purpose Project
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Martin [R] | Rep. Clyde Brawley [R] | Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Earl Jones [D] |
Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Edgar Starnes [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-135 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/13/2013 | |
2013-06-12 | Ratified | |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/11/2013 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Commerce |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013 |
2013-05-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-29 | House | Re-assigned To Commerce and Job Development |
2013-04-11 | House | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Military and Agriculture |
2013-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Finance |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-09 | House | Filed |