NC H63 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-ref Com On Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-ref Com On Commerce
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Protect North Carolina Workers Act
Title
Protect North Carolina Workers Act
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Michael Speciale [R] |
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-25 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Commerce, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-25 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-25 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-02-25 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2019-02-25 | House | Serial Referral To Commerce Stricken |
2019-02-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Commerce, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed |