NC H633 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Strengthen Criminal Gang Laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Strengthen Criminal Gang Laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-18 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-09-18HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-09-17HousePlaced On Cal For 09/18/2019
2019-09-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-27HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-27HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-27SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-08-26SenateEngrossed
2019-08-26SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-26SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-21SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/26/2019
2019-08-21SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/21/2019
2019-08-20SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/14/2019
2019-08-13SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-07SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/09/2019
2019-08-07SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/07/2019
2019-08-06SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/25/2019
2019-07-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/24/2019
2019-07-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback