NC H64 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - Ch. Res 2013-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-07 - Ch. Res 2013-2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Legislative Bldg's 50th Anniversary
Title
Honor Legislative Bldg's 50th Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - House - (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Ch. Res 2013-2 | |
2013-02-07 | Ratified | |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/06/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Cal Pursuant 32(a) |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed |