NC H645 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Motor Fuel Excise Tax Adjustment and Studies
Title
Motor Fuel Excise Tax Adjustment and Studies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-11-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2012-05-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-11-29 | Rec From House | |
2011-11-29 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-11-28 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-28 | Placed On Cal For 11/28/2011 | |
2011-11-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-11-28 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-11-28 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-11-28 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2011-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-07-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-26 | Re-ref Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-04-26 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-04-21 | Postponed To 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed On Cal For 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-04-20 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H688 (Same As) 2011-04-07 - Ch. Res 2011-5