NC H646 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prison Hospital Completion
Title
Prison Hospital Completion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - Second Reading\M8 Re-Refer\Appropriations (Y: 52 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - Second Reading\M8 Re-Refer\Appropriations (Y: 52 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-227 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Pres. To Gov. 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Ratified | |
2011-06-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-19 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2011-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-18 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-17 | Placed On Cal For 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-26 | Re-ref Com On Health and Human Services | |
2011-04-26 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-04-06 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-04-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-04-05 | Fav. For Introduction | |
2011-04-05 | Filed |