NC H647 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt Haywood Co. Elk Capital of NC
Title
Adopt Haywood Co. Elk Capital of NC
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Queen [D] | Rep. Michele Presnell [R] | Rep. John Ager [D] | Rep. Susan Fisher [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2019-05-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-07 | House | Added to Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-07 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-05-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | House | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Filed |