NC H652 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Failed To Override Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

2nd Amendment Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2nd Amendment Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-08 - House - Veto Override M4 Previous Question (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - Veto Override (Y: 66 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08HouseFailed To Override Veto
2020-07-02HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2020
2020-07-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44.2
2020-07-02HouseReceived from the Governor
2020-07-02 Vetoed 07/02/2020
2020-06-25 Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020
2020-06-25 Ratified
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-24HousePlaced On Cal For 06/25/2020
2020-06-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2020-06-24HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-23SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-19SenateEngrossed
2020-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-19SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-19SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-19SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-16SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S623 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H652
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H652v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H652v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H652v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H652v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H652v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H652v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/335
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/786
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/785
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1006
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/865
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1036
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1087
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1086

Bill Comments

feedback