NC H657 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - Ch. SL 2017-184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Improve Adult Care Home Regulation
Title
Improve Adult Care Home Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Ch. SL 2017-184 | |
2017-07-25 | Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-26 | Ratified | |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-27 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary I Stricken |
2017-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2017-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Judiciary I |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Filed |