NC H658 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ch. SL 2019-54
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allow Donations of Unexpired Drugs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow Donations of Unexpired Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Ch. SL 2019-54
2019-06-26 Signed by Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-21 Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2019
2019-06-20 Ratified
2019-06-19SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-19SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-19SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-17SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/19/2019
2019-06-17SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2019
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-04SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-02HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-02HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-05-02HousePlaced On Cal For 05/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-02HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-30HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-30HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback