NC H664 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Ch. SL 2019-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

myFutureNC/Postsecondary Attainment Goal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

myFutureNC/Postsecondary Attainment Goal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26 Ch. SL 2019-55
2019-06-26 Signed by Gov. 6/26/2019
2019-06-21 Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2019
2019-06-20 Ratified
2019-06-19HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-19HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-17HousePlaced On Cal For 06/19/2019
2019-06-17HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-14HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-14SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-06-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-12SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2019
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-05SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-05SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-05SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-29SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-29SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-29SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-29SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-26HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-18HousePlaced On Cal For 04/25/2019
2019-04-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback