NC H667 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Local Option Sales Tax Flexibility

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Option Sales Tax Flexibility

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-05-15HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-15HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-10HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback