NC H67 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-01 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-01 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permanent License Plates for Charter Schools
Title
Permanent License Plates for Charter Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2013 |
2013-06-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2013-05-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-02-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S850 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - Ref To Com On Transportation