NC H671 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Behavior Analyst Licensure
Title
Behavior Analyst Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-29 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Filed |