NC H675 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

2019 Building Code Regulatory Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

2019 Building Code Regulatory Reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-11 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - A1 Brody Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - M7 Postpone To A Day Certain Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16 Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2019
2019-07-15 Ratified
2019-07-11HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-11HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-07-10HousePlaced On Cal For 07/11/2019
2019-07-10HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-10HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-10SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-19SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-19SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-30SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-30SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-30SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-30HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-29HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-29HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-29HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-26HousePlaced On Cal For 04/29/2019
2019-04-26HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-26HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseSerial Referral To Regulatory Reform Stricken
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-04-11HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H675
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H675v6.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/227
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/226
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/225
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/475
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/649

Bill Comments

feedback