NC H678 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amend Counselor/SA/Soc. Worker Prof. Acts
Title
Amend Counselor/SA/Soc. Worker Prof. Acts
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Potts [R] | Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] | Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S300 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate