NC H679 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Ch. SL 2020-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Ch. SL 2020-46
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Rules of Civ Procedure/E-Filing and Service
Title
Rules of Civ Procedure/E-Filing and Service
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Zachary [R] | Rep. David Rogers [R] | Rep. Joe John [D] | Rep. Cynthia Ball [D] |
Rep. Marcia Morey [D] | Rep. Raymond Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Ch. SL 2020-46 | |
2020-06-26 | Signed by Gov. 6/26/2020 | |
2020-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2020 | |
2020-06-17 | Ratified | |
2020-06-17 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2020-06-16 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Engrossed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Amend Adopted A2 |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |