NC H683 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-02 - Ch. SL 2010-177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permit Extensions
Title
Permit Extensions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-02 | Ch. SL 2010-177 | |
2010-08-02 | Signed By Gov. 8/2/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-08 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Unfav For Conc | |
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-15 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-06 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-04-06 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Placed On Cal For 4/2/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-19 | Ref To Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Filed |