NC H687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Encourage Atty CLE Exempt for NCGA Employees
Title
Encourage Atty CLE Exempt for NCGA Employees
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Charles McGrady [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed |