NC H70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Ch. SL 2019-23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Delay NC HealthConnex for Certain Providers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delay NC HealthConnex for Certain Providers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06 Ch. SL 2019-23
2019-06-06 Signed by Gov. 6/6/2019
2019-06-04 Pres. To Gov. 6/4/2019
2019-06-04 Ratified
2019-06-04HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-04HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-03HousePlaced On Cal For 06/04/2019
2019-06-03HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-05-31HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-05-31SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-30SenateEngrossed
2019-05-30SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-30SenateAmend Adopted A2
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2019-05-30SenateReconsidered 3rd Reading
2019-05-29SenateEngrossed
2019-05-29SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-29SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-29SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-05-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-23SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-23SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-19HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-19HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-03-18HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-14HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-14HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H70
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H70v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/85
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/251
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/250
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/273
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/272
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/469

Bill Comments

feedback