NC H707 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ensure Safe Navigation Channels
Title
Ensure Safe Navigation Channels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-138 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Ratified | |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2013 |
2013-06-11 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2013-06-10 | House | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 |
2013-06-10 | House | Rec From Senate |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-11 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Filed |